Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Mining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0305)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB1125)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0363)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1125 (HB1168)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0363 (SB0305) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB1125) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0305 (HB0363) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1125 (HB1168) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page