Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0995)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB1266)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1266 (SB0995) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Washington County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0723 Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 (HB1266) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page