Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 /CH0670
Title
Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 (SB0766)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1552)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 /CH0670 Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 (SB0766) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0009 Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1552) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page