Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0104)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883
Title
Washington County - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Fees - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 (SB0922)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383
Title
Vehicle Laws - Military Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0428)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 (HB0046)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB1460)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1079)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0104) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0883 Washington County - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Fees - Distribution Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 (SB0922) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 Vehicle Laws - Military Vehicles - Registration and Operation Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB0428) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0104 (HB0046) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB1460) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 (HB1079) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/7/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page