Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0165)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0042
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0294)
Title
Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520)
Title
Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Duties - Offenders Under Supervision (Parole and Probation Performance Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 /CH0041
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0294 (SB0165) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521) Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 /CH0042 Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0165 (HB0294) Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520) Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 Division of Parole and Probation - Duties - Offenders Under Supervision (Parole and Probation Performance Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Smith)
Judicial Proceedings
SB0691 /CH0041 Juvenile Justice Reform Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page