Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0208
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0110
Title
Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0206
Title
Healthy Aging Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0116
Title
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903
Title
Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0208 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 /CH0110 Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 /CH0206 Healthy Aging Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0199 /CH0116 Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page