Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Labor and Employment - Organ Donation Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0662 Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016 Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1454 Labor and Employment - Organ Donation Leave Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page