Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614)
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0601 (SB0432/CH0602)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 /CH0539
Title
Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0485)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Election and Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 (SB0988/CH0386)
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613)
Title
Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0879)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 /CH0385
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 /CH0386 (HB1456)
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614) Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0488 Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0585 /CH0601 (SB0432/CH0602) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0868 /CH0539 Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 539
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 (SB0485) Orphans’ Court Judges – Election and Restriction on Practicing Law Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1436 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 (SB0988/CH0386) Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613) Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0485 (HB0879) Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Restriction on Practicing Law Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 /CH0385 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0988 /CH0386 (HB1456) Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges Senator Eckardt 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page