Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Perjury

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 /CH0531 (SB0150/CH0530)
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0530 (HB0237/CH0531)
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0237 /CH0531 (SB0150/CH0530) Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0082 Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0530 (HB0237/CH0531) Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page