Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 (SB0643)
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0021
Title
Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0524)
Title
End the Gridlock
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0422
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0524 (SB0643) Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Rules
HB1322 Transportation Infrastructure Bank Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0085 /CH0021 Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0524) End the Gridlock Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0422 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Miller 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page