Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0415 (SB0264)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Economic Justice and Racial Reconciliation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366 (SB0477/CH0481)
Title
Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470
Title
Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0671)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0533
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0076/CH0415)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 /CH0357
Title
Disclosure of Tax Information - Fraud Identification, Prevention, or Response
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0481 (HB0366)
Title
Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0849)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0255
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0415 (SB0264) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0159 Economic Justice and Racial Reconciliation Act Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0236 Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0366 (SB0477/CH0481) Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0470 Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0671) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0093 /CH0533 Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 (HB0076/CH0415) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0272 /CH0357 Disclosure of Tax Information - Fraud Identification, Prevention, or Response Senator Guzzone 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 /CH0481 (HB0366) Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0849) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0255 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page