Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Radiation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0717)
Title
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB1339)
Title
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1136 /CH0472
Title
Regulation of Radiation Sources - Fee - Exemption for Pro Bono Temporary Dental Clinics
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1339 (SB0717) Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees and Inspections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB1339) Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1136 /CH0472 Regulation of Radiation Sources - Fee - Exemption for Pro Bono Temporary Dental Clinics Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page