Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120
Title
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0135)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0359)
Title
State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778 /CH0054 (SB0514/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Transportation - Maryland Rail Authority - Establishment (Maryland Rail Investment Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419
Title
Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0171)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0326)
Title
State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 /CH0052 (HB0778/CH0054)
Title
Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Transportation Systems - Rapid Rail Local Development Councils
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 (SB0135) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0326 (SB0359) State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0632 Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0778 /CH0054 (SB0514/CH0052) Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 54
Appropriations
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB0846 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Transportation - Maryland Rail Authority - Establishment (Maryland Rail Investment Act of 2022) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1419 Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0171) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0208 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0359 (HB0326) State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0514 /CH0052 (HB0778/CH0054) Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act) Senator Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 52
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1013 Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Transportation Systems - Rapid Rail Local Development Councils Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Budget and Taxation
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page