Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0661 (SB0253/CH0660)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Montgomery County – Voting Methods MC 03–23
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0792/CH0647)
Title
Estates and Trusts – Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0204)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
State's Attorney, Clerk of the Circuit Court, Register of Wills, Sheriff, and Judge of the Orphans' Court - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB1236)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 /CH0660 (HB0244/CH0661)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0647 (HB0755)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 /CH0661 (SB0253/CH0660) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures Delegate Terrasa 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Judiciary
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0344 Montgomery County – Voting Methods MC 03–23 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0755 (SB0792/CH0647) Estates and Trusts – Registered Domestic Partnerships Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1236 (SB0204) State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0132 State's Attorney, Clerk of the Circuit Court, Register of Wills, Sheriff, and Judge of the Orphans' Court - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Judicial Proceedings
SB0204 (HB1236) State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2023 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 /CH0660 (HB0244/CH0661) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0647 (HB0755) Estates and Trusts - Registered Domestic Partnerships Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/22/2023 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page