Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Settlement Procedures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 (SB0524)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Homestead and Homeowners' Property Tax Credits - Access and Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0739)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0739 (SB0524) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1255 Homestead and Homeowners' Property Tax Credits - Access and Eligibility Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0739) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page