Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0473
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313
Title
Environment - Exception to Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0851 Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1300 /CH0473 Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1313 Environment - Exception to Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirements Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page