Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0576)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 (SB0599)
Title
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0151
Title
State Government - Web Sites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0168)
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 (HB1280)
Title
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 (SB0576) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 (SB0599) AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption Procedures Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 /CH0151 State Government - Web Sites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0168) General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0599 (HB1280) AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption Procedures Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page