Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0390 (SB0140)
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 (SB0997)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0051/CH0390)
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997 (HB1476)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 /CH0390 (SB0140) Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1262 Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 (SB0997) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/06/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0140 (HB0051/CH0390) Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0288 Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0997 (HB1476) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page