Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tax Returns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0110 (SB0369/CH0111)
Title
Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268 /CH0327 (SB0274/CH0328)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0596)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 /CH0112
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0443)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0253
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845 (SB0623)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Income of Health Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941
Title
Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138 (SB0809)
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Income Tax – Credit for Cybersecurity Measures Undertaken by Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0254
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 /CH0328 (HB0268/CH0327)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0111 (HB0252/CH0110)
Title
Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0681)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 (HB0321)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0845)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Income of Health Care Workers
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1138)
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0252 /CH0110 (SB0369/CH0111) Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0268 /CH0327 (SB0274/CH0328) Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations Delegate Henson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0321 (SB0596) Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule and Combined Reporting Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 /CH0112 Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners Delegate Ivey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 (SB0443) Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0253 Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0845 (SB0623) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Income of Health Care Workers Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1138 (SB0809) Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 Income Tax – Credit for Cybersecurity Measures Undertaken by Small Businesses Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 /CH0254 Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0274 /CH0328 (HB0268/CH0327) Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0360 Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 /CH0111 (HB0252/CH0110) Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0681) Income Tax - Credit for Pet-Friendly Rental Dwelling Units Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0596 (HB0321) Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB0845) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Income of Health Care Workers Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 (HB1138) Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page