Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/18/2022 1:44:45 AM
Thursday, January 20, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Please see House Judiciary Committee's hearing schedule to watch live on YouTube
Briefing: Hospital Liability and the 2021 HSCRC Report

Created: 1/13/2022 3:37 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)

Click to return on the top page