Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/27/2023 10:01:42 AM
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
House
Created: 1/10/2023 3:39 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Total Cost of Care Model and Maryland Primary Care Program

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Canceled
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/19/2023 2:13 PM
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Introduction to the Pharmaceutical Pricing Chain
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:24 PM)
Organizational Meeting
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:24 PM)
Pharmaceutical Chain
(Removed - 1/20/2023 1:24 PM)

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/18/2023 3:04 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Impact of Violence on Health Care in Maryland

Click to return on the top page