Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/27/2023 11:48:07 PM
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
House
Created: 1/10/2023 10:03 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Sevices on Maryland's Revenue Structure
Briefing Agenda
Presentation

Created: 1/12/2023 3:51 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines
Del J. Lewis

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Del J. Lewis

Primary and Secondary Education – Title IX – Notice (Hear Our Voices Act)
Del Cardin

Sports Wagering Campaign Contributions Parity Act of 2023
(Added - 1/12/2023 6:32 PM)
Del Hill

Election Judges - Training and Signs - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Del Qi

Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
Del Charkoudian

Public Schools - Dual Language Education - Teacher Certification, Program Implementation, and Study
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Tax Sales - Notices and Payoff Amount for Redemption
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Tax Sales - Payment of Balance After Foreclosure
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax – Tax Sales – Requirement to Sell
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Tax Sales - Redemption
Del R. Long

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony.
Del Hartman

Education – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Del Griffith

Harford County - Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony.
Del R. Long

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
(Removed - 1/19/2023 3:45 PM)
Del R. Long

Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Pilot Program
(Removed - 1/19/2023 3:45 PM)

Click to return on the top page