Day(s)
As of: 4/25/2024 12:47:58 PM
Created: 1/31/2022 11:39 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Carter
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
(Added - 2/3/2022 2:13 PM)
Sen West
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees Without Court Approval
Sen Waldstreicher
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
(Added - 2/3/2022 2:13 PM)
(Removed - 2/1/2022 5:11 PM)
Sen Young
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation
(Removed - 2/15/2022 9:19 AM)
(Removed - 2/16/2022 9:47 AM)