Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 6/24/2021 4:09:48 PM
Thursday, February 27, 2020
House
Created: 2/6/2020 11:46 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Kipke, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Specialty Drugs – Definition
Del Kipke

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Dels Sample-Hughes and Kipke

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Duties and Obligations
Del K. Young, et al

Mail Order and Specialty Drugs - Physician Dispensing
Del Kelly

Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Dels Pendergrass and Cullison

State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/10/2020 4:31 PM)
Del Johnson, et al

Health Insurance - Audits of Claims by Pharmacies or Pharmacists - Deadlines
(Added - 2/10/2020 4:31 PM)
Del Kipke, et al

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
(Added - 2/10/2020 4:31 PM)
Del P. Young, et al

Health Insurance - Requirements for Establishing Step Therapy Protocol and Requesting Exceptions
(Added - 2/10/2020 4:31 PM)
Del Shetty, et al

Prescription Drug Benefits - Use of Real-Time Benefit Check Technology
(Removed - 2/11/2020 2:00 PM)
Del Kipke

State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit
(Removed - 2/25/2020 11:27 AM)
Del Morgan, et al

Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
(Removed - 2/27/2020 10:46 AM)

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 2/25/2020 8:32 AM
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Hill, et al

Public Health - Schedule II Controlled Dangerous Substances - Partial Filling of Prescriptions
Del Rosenberg

Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Del Bagnall

State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
Del Barron, et al

Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Del Cullison

Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Del K. Young, et al

Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
(Added - 2/25/2020 3:10 PM)
Del Kipke, et al

Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Authority to Prescribe and Administer Medication
Del Krebs, et al

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Del Kelly, et al

Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
(Removed - 2/26/2020 1:46 PM)

Click to return on the top page