Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/24/2022 9:44:08 PM
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 4/5/2022 12:23 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 4/12/2022 7:55 AM
12:00 PM - Rocky Gap Casino Resort, Allegany Center Side B, 16701 Lakeview Road, NE, Flintstone, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce; Economic Development Partnerships and Emerging Industries in Western Maryland; and a presentation by First Energy/Potomac Edison.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 4/20/2022 2:30 PM
Thursday, May 12, 2022 9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
3:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Additional meeting information is available at the Commission's website
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business and approval of 100% of the Capital Improvement Program.

Click to return on the top page