Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 481

File Code: Education - Local Bills Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 407
Sponsored By:
Baltimore County Delegation
Entitled:
Baltimore County - Elected School Board

Synopsis:

Establishing procedures for the election of the members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; repealing provisions governing the appointment of members of the county board; requiring members of the county board to reside in, be a registered voter in, and be elected from specified districts; providing for the removal of members and the appointment of a member to fill a vacancy; establishing a Baltimore County School Board Redistricting Commission; providing for staggering of specified terms; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
2/2
First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24

Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21
Favorable with Amendments {975165/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (124-8)
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/29
Favorable with Amendments {954933/1 Report Adopted
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Kelley) Rejected (18-23)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Special Order until later today (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {203626/1 Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-9)

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Ballots
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
County Councils
County Executives
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Hearings
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Local Government Mandates
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Reports
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 3-109 , 3-114 , 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-09 )
Election Law
( 8-801 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 975165/01     Offered on: March 24, 2012   at: 5:36 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 203626/01     Offered on: April 5, 2012   at: 12:51 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 954933/01     Offered on: April 4, 2012   at: 6:00 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2012: Third Reading Passed (124-8)
Senate
March 29, 2012: Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Kelley) Rejected (18-23)
March 30, 2012: Third Reading Passed (34-9)
Click to return on the top page