Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that changing facilities suitable for changing the diaper of a child and providing personal care for an adult be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings by October 1, 2022; requiring certain entities to report to 2-1-1 Maryland, Inc., the location of changing facilities when changing facilities are installed; requiring 2-1-1 to maintain a list of changing facilities on its website; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt certain standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0061
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0010 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/17/2020
Legislative Date
7/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/17/2020 7/17/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text - Chapter - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Age
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:33 PM
Click to return on the top page