Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 909

File Code: Private Sector Labor and Industry Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 819
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Kelley, Raskin, Currie, Forehand, Gladden, Harrington, King, Klausmeier, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Stone
Entitled:
Workplace Fraud Act of 2009

Synopsis:

Prohibiting specified employers from failing to properly classify individuals who perform work for remuneration paid by the employer; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to initiate an investigation under specified circumstances to determine whether specified violations occurred; requiring the Commissioner to enforce specified provisions; establishing the method of determining whether an employer-employee relationship exists for purposes of proper classification under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/12
First Reading Senate Rules
2/18
Re-referred Finance
2/19
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
3/28
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway)
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway)
Special Order 4/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted
3/30
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) Withdrawn
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted (25-21)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
4/9
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/29
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/8
Re-referred Economic Matters
Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/8
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-32)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 188

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Accountants
Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Budget and Management, Department of
Circuit Courts
Citations
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Construction
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Evidence
Fines
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Hearings
Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest.
Judgments
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Penalties
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Unemployment
Workers` Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Labor and Employment
( 2-107 , 3-101 , 3-102 , 3-103 , 3-104 , 3-901 , 3-902 , 3-903 , 3-904 , 3-905 , 3-906 , 3-907 , 3-908 , 3-909 , 3-910 , 3-911 , 3-912 , 3-913 , 3-914 , 3-915 , 3-916 , 3-917 , 3-918 , 3-919 , 3-920 , 8-201 , 8-201.1 , 8-205 , 8-610.1 , 8-628 , 9-202 , 9-315.1 , 9-316 , 9-402.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 773625/01     Offered on: April 1, 2009   at: 5:25 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Number: 883029/01     Offered on: April 1, 2009   at: 5:26 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 987077/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 10:25 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 713094/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 12:25 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 30, 2009: Floor Amendment (Conway J) {883029/1 Adopted (25-21)
March 31, 2009: Third Reading Passed (34-13)
April 9, 2009: Third Reading Passed (33-13)
House
April 8, 2009: Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Click to return on the top page