Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 30
Status as of April 14, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 11
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 171
Status as of April 7, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 14, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 113
Status as of April 14, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 141
Status as of April 11, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of March 28, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 317
Status as of March 17, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters
Status as of February 18, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 450
Status as of February 16, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of March 4, 2009: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Judiciary
Status as of April 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 642
Status as of March 11, 2009: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Ways and Means
Status as of April 14, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 10
Status as of May 19, 2009: Vetoed by the Governor - Policy
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 172
Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of January 30, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 26, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of February 19, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of February 25, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 316
Status as of March 23, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of April 14, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 112
Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 641
Status as of March 9, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs