Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 620

File Code: Real Property Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 597
Sponsored By:
Delegates Frush, Barnes, and Pena-Melnyk
Entitled:
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Common Elements and Common Areas - Implied Warranties

Synopsis:

Requiring the description of the common elements in a condominium declaration that is recorded on or after October 1, 2010, to include specified improvements; providing that specified provisions of the Act do not apply to a condominium that is occupied and used solely for nonresidential purposes; altering the duration of a specified implied warranty on the common elements of a condominium; altering the duration of a specified implied warranty on the common areas of a homeowners association; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/3
First Reading Environmental Matters
2/10
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/24
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Senate Action
3/26
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/4
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 4/9 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Kramer) Adopted (26-21)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/7
Special Order later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Condominiums
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Homeowners Associations
Warranties

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Real Property
( 11-103 , 11-131 , 11B-110 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 350119/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 11:58 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 328879/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 10:19 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 633427/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 10:19 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 24, 2010: Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Senate
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Kramer) {633427/1 Adopted (26-21)
Click to return on the top page