Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 4

File Code: Public Health
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hubbard, Cullison, A. Kelly, Kipke, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, and V. Turner
Entitled:
Public Health - Containers of Infant Formula Manufactured with Bisphenol-A - Prohibition

Synopsis:

Prohibiting the State from purchasing infant formula in containers and prohibiting the manufacture, sale, or distribution of containers containing a specified amount of bisphenol-A on or after July 1, 2014; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations on or before January 1, 2012; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of provisions of the Act under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
9/23
Pre-filed
1/12
First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/26
Hearing 2/8 at 2:00 p.m.
1/28
Hearing cancelled
2/2
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/3
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Finance
3/28
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4
Favorable Report by Finance
4/1
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/2
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 190

Sponsored by:

Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate Ariana B. Kelly, District 16
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Peter Murphy, District 28
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation

Bill affects the following Statute:

Health - General
( 24-304 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 506080/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 10:07 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2011: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
April 2, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page