Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 560

File Code: Health Occupations Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 641
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hubbard, Pendergrass, and V. Turner
Entitled:
Polysomnography - Technologists Licensure

Synopsis:

Extending to October 1, 2013, the date by which an individual is required to be licensed by the State Board of Physicians before the individual may practice polysomnography in the State; extending to September 30, 2013, the date before which the Board is required to waive a specified education requirement for specified individuals; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/8
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/23
Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
4/6
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/7
Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/5
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 268

Sponsored by:

Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Examinations
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates.
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Reports
Substance Abuse

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health Occupations
( 14-5C-08 , 14-5C-10 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 416681/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 10:11 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2011: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
April 5, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Click to return on the top page