Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 11
Status as of March 22, 1999: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of February 11, 1999: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of May 27, 1999: Became Law - Chapter 648
Status as of May 27, 1999: Became Law - Chapter 657
Status as of April 9, 1999: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of May 27, 1999: Became Law - Chapter 676
Status as of March 8, 1999: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Budget and Taxation
Status as of March 18, 1999: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance
Status as of March 1, 1999: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of April 9, 1999: Bill is in the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments