Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 29
Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 149
Status as of March 2, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of February 18, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of March 16, 2010: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations
Status as of March 22, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary
Status as of April 6, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations
Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 605
Status as of April 12, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 446
Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 450
Status as of April 6, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations
Status as of February 22, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 452
Status as of February 22, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 594
Status as of February 22, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of February 24, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 740
Status as of March 24, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of February 22, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 1, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of February 10, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 8, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Finance
Status as of February 12, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 593
Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 604
Status as of March 8, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance
Status as of March 22, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 31, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters