House Agenda for Proceedings No. 49
Appropriations Committee Report No. 12
Completed
Economic Matters Committee Report No. 16
Completed
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 14
Completed
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 15
Completed
Health and Government Operations Committee Report No. 8
Completed
Judiciary Committee Report No. 8
Completed
Ways and Means Committee Report No. 11
Completed
Special Order Calendar No. 32
Completed
Special Order Calendar No. 37
Completed
Special Order Calendar No. 44
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 39
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 43
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 47
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 48
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 53
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 54
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 55
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 56
Completed
Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 58
Completed
Appropriations Committee Report No. 12
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
Economic Matters Committee Report No. 16
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 14
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 15
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
Health and Government Operations Committee Report No. 8
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
Judiciary Committee Report No. 8
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
Ways and Means Committee Report No. 11
Distribution Date: March 19, 2016 Second Reading Date: March 19, 2016 |
|||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
|||||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Special Order Calendar No. 32 |
||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
March 18, 2016 Special Order Calendar No. 37 |
||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
March 19, 2016 Special Order Calendar No. 44 |
||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
March 15, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 39 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 15, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 43 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 16, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 47 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 16, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 48 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 53 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 54 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 55 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 56 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
March 17, 2016 Calendar of Third Reading House Bills No. 58 |
|||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|
|||||||
|