Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Senate Index

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number
January 8, 2020 January 8, 2020 1 (Journalized)
January 9, 2020 January 9, 2020 2 (Journalized)
January 10, 2020 January 10, 2020 3 (Journalized)
January 13, 2020 January 13, 2020 4 (Journalized)
January 14, 2020 January 14, 2020 5 (Journalized)
January 15, 2020 January 15, 2020 6 (Journalized)
January 16, 2020 January 16, 2020 7 (Journalized)
January 17, 2020 January 17, 2020 8 (Journalized)
January 20, 2020 January 20, 2020 9 (Journalized)
January 21, 2020 January 21, 2020 10 (Journalized)
January 22, 2020 January 22, 2020 11 (Journalized)
January 23, 2020 January 23, 2020 12 (Journalized)
January 24, 2020 January 24, 2020 13 (Journalized)
January 27, 2020 January 27, 2020 14 (Journalized)
January 28, 2020 January 28, 2020 15 (Journalized)
January 29, 2020 January 29, 2020 16 (Journalized)
January 30, 2020 January 30, 2020 17 (Journalized)
January 31, 2020 January 31, 2020 18 (Journalized)
February 3, 2020 February 3, 2020 19 (Journalized)
February 4, 2020 February 4, 2020 20 (Journalized)
February 5, 2020 February 5, 2020 21 (Journalized)
February 5, 2020 February 5, 2020 21-A (Journalized)
February 6, 2020 February 6, 2020 22 (Journalized)
February 7, 2020 February 7, 2020 23 (Journalized)
February 10, 2020 February 10, 2020 24 (Journalized)
February 10, 2020 February 10, 2020 24-A (Journalized)
February 11, 2020 February 11, 2020 25 (Journalized)
February 12, 2020 February 12, 2020 26 (Journalized)
February 13, 2020 February 13, 2020 27 (Journalized)
February 14, 2020 February 14, 2020 28 (Journalized)
February 17, 2020 February 17, 2020 29 (Journalized)
February 17, 2020 February 17, 2020 29-A (Journalized)
February 18, 2020 February 18, 2020 30 (Journalized)
February 19, 2020 February 19, 2020 31
February 20, 2020 February 20, 2020 32
Proceedings
Calendar Date
January 8, 2020
Legislative Date
January 8, 2020
Proceedings Number
1 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 9, 2020
Legislative Date
January 9, 2020
Proceedings Number
2 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 10, 2020
Legislative Date
January 10, 2020
Proceedings Number
3 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 13, 2020
Legislative Date
January 13, 2020
Proceedings Number
4 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 14, 2020
Legislative Date
January 14, 2020
Proceedings Number
5 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 15, 2020
Legislative Date
January 15, 2020
Proceedings Number
6 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 16, 2020
Legislative Date
January 16, 2020
Proceedings Number
7 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 17, 2020
Legislative Date
January 17, 2020
Proceedings Number
8 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 20, 2020
Legislative Date
January 20, 2020
Proceedings Number
9 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 21, 2020
Legislative Date
January 21, 2020
Proceedings Number
10 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 22, 2020
Legislative Date
January 22, 2020
Proceedings Number
11 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 23, 2020
Legislative Date
January 23, 2020
Proceedings Number
12 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 24, 2020
Legislative Date
January 24, 2020
Proceedings Number
13 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 27, 2020
Legislative Date
January 27, 2020
Proceedings Number
14 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 28, 2020
Legislative Date
January 28, 2020
Proceedings Number
15 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 29, 2020
Legislative Date
January 29, 2020
Proceedings Number
16 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 30, 2020
Legislative Date
January 30, 2020
Proceedings Number
17 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 31, 2020
Legislative Date
January 31, 2020
Proceedings Number
18 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 3, 2020
Legislative Date
February 3, 2020
Proceedings Number
19 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 4, 2020
Legislative Date
February 4, 2020
Proceedings Number
20 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 5, 2020
Legislative Date
February 5, 2020
Proceedings Number
21 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 5, 2020
Legislative Date
February 5, 2020
Proceedings Number
21-A (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 6, 2020
Legislative Date
February 6, 2020
Proceedings Number
22 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 7, 2020
Legislative Date
February 7, 2020
Proceedings Number
23 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 10, 2020
Legislative Date
February 10, 2020
Proceedings Number
24 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 10, 2020
Legislative Date
February 10, 2020
Proceedings Number
24-A (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 11, 2020
Legislative Date
February 11, 2020
Proceedings Number
25 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 12, 2020
Legislative Date
February 12, 2020
Proceedings Number
26 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 13, 2020
Legislative Date
February 13, 2020
Proceedings Number
27 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 14, 2020
Legislative Date
February 14, 2020
Proceedings Number
28 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 17, 2020
Legislative Date
February 17, 2020
Proceedings Number
29 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 17, 2020
Legislative Date
February 17, 2020
Proceedings Number
29-A (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 18, 2020
Legislative Date
February 18, 2020
Proceedings Number
30 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
February 19, 2020
Legislative Date
February 19, 2020
Proceedings Number
31
Calendar Date
February 20, 2020
Legislative Date
February 20, 2020
Proceedings Number
32
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 11:50 AM