Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Publications

Title Published
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Emergency Regulations 10/21/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 1/13/2020 through 2/2/2020 2/3/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 10/2/2020 through 10/15/2020 10/16/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 12/27/2019 through 1/12/2020 1/13/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 2/21/2020 through 3/5/2020 3/6/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 2/3/2020 through 2/20/2020 2/21/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 3/30/2020 through 4/9/2020 4/10/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 3/6/2020 through 3/29/2020 3/30/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 4/10/2020 through 4/30/2020 5/1/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 5/1/2020 through 5/14/2020 5/15/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 5/15/2020 through 5/28/2020 5/29/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 5/29/2020 through 6/11/2020 6/12/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 6/12/2020 through 6/25/2020 6/26/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 6/26/2020 through 7/16/2020 7/17/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 7/17/2020 through 7/23/2020 7/24/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 7/24/2020 through 8/6/2020 8/7/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 8/7/2020 through 8/20/2020 8/21/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 8/7/2020 through 9/3/2020 9/4/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 9/18/2020 through 10/1/2020 10/2/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Synopses of Regulations received from 9/4/2020 through 9/17/2020 9/18/2020
2020 - Joint Committee on Pensions - 2019 Interim Report 4/1/2020
2020 - Legislative Policy Committee - Summary Reports of Committees to the Legislative Policy Committee (2019 Interim Report) 1/1/2020
2020 - Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee Workgroup Report on COVID-19 and Housing 7/27/2020
2020 - Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee Workgroup Report on the Courts and Criminal Justice System During the COVID-19 Pandemic 8/11/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 1 1/29/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 2 2/5/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 3 2/12/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 4 2/19/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 5 2/26/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 6 2/26/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 7 3/11/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 8 3/13/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Report 9 3/15/2020
2020 Regular Session - Senate Executive Nominations Committee Summary Report 3/16/2020