Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/20/2020 10:14:08 PM
Monday, January 20, 2020
Monday, January 20, 2020
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 20, 2020 10:43 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 29, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0002
Sens Miller and Ferguson

Digital Advertising Gross Revenues - Taxation
ADDED: 10:43 AM
SB0003
Sen McCray

Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
ADDED: 10:43 AM
SB0004
Sen Zucker

Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
ADDED: 10:43 AM
SB0058
Sen West

Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
ADDED: 10:43 AM
SB0216
Sen Pinsky, et al

Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
ADDED: 10:43 AM
SB0223
Sen Feldman, et al

Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
ADDED: 10:43 AM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 20, 2020 8:44 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 22, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0251
Sen Pinsky

Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
ADDED: 8:44 PM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 20, 2020 10:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 22, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0008
Chr FIN (Dept)

Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
REMOVED: 10:57 AM

Change made: January 20, 2020 10:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0224
Sen Feldman

Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
ADDED: 10:57 AM
SB0226
Sen Waldstreicher

Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
ADDED: 10:57 AM
SB0229
Sen Lee, et al

Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
ADDED: 10:57 AM

Change made: January 20, 2020 10:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 12, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0201
Sen Lee

Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
ADDED: 10:57 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2020 8:05 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 28, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0170
Del Lierman, et al

Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
REMOVED: 8:05 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 20, 2020 9:37 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 21, 2020 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 21, 2020 2:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on Fiscal Matters and the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education (Kirwan Commission)

Change made: January 20, 2020 9:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0197
Del Parrott, et al

Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
HB0198
Del Cain, et al

Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
HB0199
Chr W&M (Dept)

Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
HB0216
Del Cardin, et al

Election Law - Campaign Material - Definition and Authority Line for Telephone Calls
HB0226
Del Long

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
HB0245
Dels Luedtke and Mosby

Election Law - Institutions of Higher Education - Voter Registration and Voting by Students (Student Voter Empowerment Act of 2020)