Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/22/2020 2:23:56 AM
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Patterson

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
(Added - 1/15/2020 2:51 PM)
Sen Ellis

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
(Added - 1/14/2020 1:50 PM)
Sen Elfreth

Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Sen McCray

Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Sens Young and Feldman

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sen Elfreth, et al

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:03 PM)
Sen Salling, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:03 PM)
Sen Feldman

Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
(Removed - 1/14/2020 10:29 AM)

Created: 1/8/2020 10:03 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Reilly

Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen West

Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sen Hayes

Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
Sen Beidle

Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sen West

Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sen Simonaire

Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sen Ellis

Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sen Hough

Public Schools - Student Discipline Regulations - Remedial Measures
Chr EHE (Dept)

Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements
(Added - 1/8/2020 10:21 AM)
Sens Lam and Hough

General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
(Added - 1/15/2020 12:50 PM)
Sen Pinsky

Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
(Added - 1/20/2020 8:44 PM)

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements

Created: 12/20/2019 1:29 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Chr FIN (Dept)

Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Chr FIN (Dept)

Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Chr FIN (Dept)

Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
(Removed - 1/20/2020 10:57 AM)

Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - Fiscal and Kirwin Briefings

Created: 1/13/2020 11:41 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the 1:00 pm briefing.
Sen Cassilly, et al

Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sen McCray

Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
Sen Young

Criminal Law - Kratom - Prohibition
Sen West

Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress

House
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Maryland Center for School Safety
Interagency Commission on School Construction
Maryland State Library Agency
Maryland African American Museum Corporation
MEDCO

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Subsequent Injury Fund
Workers' Compensation Commission
Board of Public Works
Executive Department - Governor
DPSCS Community Supervision

Created: 1/14/2020 4:53 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
DNR: Power Plant Research Program
Required Reports: RPS, Nuclear Generation

Created: 1/8/2020 2:53 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
(1) The Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC) on Rural Health Grants; (2) Update from the Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission (MMCC)

Created: 1/9/2020 12:33 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services – Fiscal and Kirwan Briefings

Created: 1/9/2020 12:33 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Queen

Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Del Parrott, et al

Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Del Grammer

Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
(Added - 1/10/2020 3:49 PM)
Del Cardin

Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
(Removed - 1/13/2020 8:55 PM)

Created: 1/6/2020 10:32 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Local Aid by the Department of Legislative Services, Maryland Association of Counties, and the Maryland Municipal League

Other
Howard
Created: 1/16/2020 4:47 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint Work Session with the Senate Howard County Delegation - Select Committee No. 5

Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 1/14/2020 5:05 PM
Work Session
11:00 AM - Joint Hearing Room, Department of Legislative Services, 90 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
10:30 AM - Room 206, Legislative Services Building, 90 State Circle, Annapolis
The meeting will convene immediately following session.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 12/20/2019 3:03 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - White Oak Community Rec Center, 1700 April Lane, Silver Spring, MD
Metro Regional Listening Session

Created: 12/20/2019 3:03 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - White Oak Community Rec Center, 1700 April Lane, Silver Spring, MD
Metro Regional Listening Session

No. 5 - Howard County
Created: 1/16/2020 4:48 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint with the House of Delegates Howard County Delegation