Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial Scholarship
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, C. Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, Patterson, Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Naming the Workforce Shortage Student Assistance grant for child care providers to be the grant known as the Hattie N. Harrison Memorial Scholarship.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2015 1/16/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {105069/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM