Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters related to low-barrier shelters and make certain recommendations on volunteering; requiring the Task Force, by December 31, 2019, to report its findings and recommendations to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the Baltimore City Council, the Governor, and the General Assembly; terminating the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1797 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM