Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0005


CH0021

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsored by
Delegates Chang, Bartlett, Clippinger, Atterbeary, J. Lewis, Moon, Cardin, Crutchfield, Lopez, Williams, McComas, Pippy, Griffith, R. Watson, Shetty, W. Fisher, Cox, D.M. Davis, Anderson, Conaway, and Malone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from placing or inscribing an item or a symbol, including an actual or depicted noose or swastika, whether temporary or permanent, on any real or personal property, public or private, without the express permission of the owner, owner's agent, or lawful occupant of the property, with the intent to threaten or intimidate any person or group of persons; and establishing that a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both applies to a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0004 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/11/2019
Legislative Date
10/11/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {942614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/11/2019 10/11/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {942614/1 Adopted 15
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 17
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 18
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:05 PM