Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a distribution from a certain trust fund to be used for certain purposes; permitting a certain cemetery to select a certain method of distribution from a certain perpetual care trust fund; requiring the cemetery to submit a certain statement to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight if the cemetery selects a certain method of distribution from the perpetual care trust fund; requiring the Director to make a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2027; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0192
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0243 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/06/2020
Legislative Date
8/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/06/2020 8/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:40 PM
Click to return on the top page