Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the title of the Executive Director of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to be the Chief Executive Officer of the Corporation; increasing the membership of the Board of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation from 15 to 19 members; requiring that at least one of the two Board members representing colleges and university represent an historically black college or university; altering the quorum requirement; authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make certain changes; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0080
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1002 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/11/2020
Legislative Date
9/11/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905861/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2020 9/11/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {905861/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Finance 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page