Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on or before October 1, 2018, to adopt regulations to establish procedures for conducting environmental investigations to determine lead hazards for children under the age of 6 and pregnant women with elevated blood lead levels greater than or equal to 10 micrograms per deciliter; altering the conditions under which an owner of an affected property is required to comply with specified risk reduction standards under specified provisions of law relating to reducing lead risk in housing; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/13/2016
Legislative Date
9/13/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800013/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/13/2016 9/13/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Children With Elevated Blood Lead Levels - Environmental Investigation
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {800013/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-305, 6-819 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM