Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones and McIntosh
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "fully online distance education program" to mean a program, originating outside the State, offered by an out-of-state institution in which a student domiciled in Maryland enrolls, 51% or more of the program is offered through electronic distribution, and the Commission determines that the portion of the program offered at a location in the State, if any, does not require a specified certificate of approval; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
10/22/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824269/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/05/2015 10/22/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {824269/1 Report Adopted 20
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM