Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Brooks, Bagnall, Charkoudian, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for a certain veteran to reside at a home for veterans that is supervised by the Department of Veterans Affairs to include a veteran who has an honorable discharge from active service with a uniformed service of the United States.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0341
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2019
Legislative Date
10/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776586/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2019 10/25/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {776586/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 11:30 AM