Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Boyce, Patterson, Love, Hettleman, Lierman, Arentz, Anderton, Clark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lehman, Ruth, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a certain balloon into the atmosphere; authorizing the Department to delegate certain enforcement authority to a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations to the Department; establishing a maximum civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0028
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670010/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Anderton) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-47)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {670010/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Anderton) Adopted 32
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (92-47) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM