Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income if contributions to the individual retirement account or annuity consist entirely of the tax-free rollover of distributions from an employee retirement system; repealing a certain obsolete provision relating to a certain retirement plan; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0058 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/19/2018
Legislative Date
11/19/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2019
Legislative Date
1/08/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/19/2018 11/19/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 1/08/2019 1/08/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM