Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
Sponsored by
Delegate Harrison
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, each student enrolled in a public elementary or secondary school in the State to submit a certificate of dental health to the school on a schedule established by the Department; and requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a standard form for a certificate of dental health to county boards of education and certain parents and guardians.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2019
Legislative Date
10/02/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 10/02/2019 10/02/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Health - Certificate of Dental Health
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-402.1 )
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:16 AM